|
10/05/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 520, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2390.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1719.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1636.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|