Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3425.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3364.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|