07/09/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 57, Statutes of 2021. | |||
07/09/2021 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/30/2021 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/24/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1632.). | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2021 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 15). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1153.) | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2021 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2021 | Read first time. To print. |