California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB592 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill June 24, 2021
Bill June 14, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021