Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 3370.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 16. Page 3365.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|