Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2021 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. | ||
Assembly | 12/07/2020 | Read first time. To print. |