|
09/30/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 412, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2973.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2528.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1766.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.M. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|