Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2021 | Read first time. To print. |