|
09/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 368, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2825.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2348.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1719.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1250.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/07/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|