Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2021 | Read first time. To print. |