|
10/07/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 621, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2729.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2301.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1716.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 963.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|