California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill July 8, 2021
Bill June 16, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021