Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2021
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 1712.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|