Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3436.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|