LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB657
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB657
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB657
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 12, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 2, 2022
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 27, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 11, 2022
Compare
Bill
August 1, 2022
Compare
Bill
June 21, 2022
Compare
Bill
June 8, 2022
Compare
Bill
June 15, 2021
Compare
Bill
April 21, 2021
Compare