|
10/06/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3164.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2021
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3163.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2632.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Pursuant to JR 33.1
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2391.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S., JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1638.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|