California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB673 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill August 19, 2021
Bill June 10, 2021