California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB676 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill May 26, 2022
Bill January 14, 2022
Bill January 3, 2022