California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB68 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2021

Amended

Bill August 26, 2021
Bill July 12, 2021
Bill June 1, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021