California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB680 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2021

Amended

Bill September 3, 2021
Bill August 26, 2021
Bill July 13, 2021
Bill June 30, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021