California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2021

Chaptered

Bill August 31, 2021

Amended

Bill July 13, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021