Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2021 | Read first time. To print. |