|
09/22/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2114.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1721.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1710.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|