Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 16. Page 1688.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|