California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB721 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2021

Amended

Bill August 16, 2021
Bill July 5, 2021
Bill June 23, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 28, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021