|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 742, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5052.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 3325.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|