California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB738 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2022

Amended

Bill June 2, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022
Bill January 3, 2022
Bill March 25, 2021