California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB748 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2022

Amended

Bill June 16, 2022
Bill June 2, 2022
Bill January 3, 2022