|
10/07/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 623, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2735.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2288.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1281.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|