Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2021 | Read first time. To print. |