|
09/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 233, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2648.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2225.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1655.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|