|
10/06/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2458.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 1065.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|