California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB789 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2021

Amended

Bill June 28, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021