California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB798 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2021

Amended

Bill June 2, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021