California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB829 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2021

Amended

Bill August 31, 2021
Bill June 29, 2021
Bill June 15, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021