California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB83 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill March 15, 2021

Chaptered

Bill March 17, 2021

Amended

Bill March 10, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021
Bill February 17, 2021