|
09/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 2738.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2296.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 18. Page 1357.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|