|
10/04/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 471, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 6. Page 2829.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2334.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 14. Page 1182.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|