|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 705, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2648.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2228.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1655.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|