Assembly
|
09/27/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 14.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 5203.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 21. Page 1328.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|