|
10/08/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 706, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 21. Page 3068.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2565.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 20. Page 1366.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|