|
07/09/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1634.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1337.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|