Assembly
|
02/01/2022
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|