Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2021 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2021 | Read first time. To print. |