|
09/30/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 416, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3142.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2618.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1470.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|