California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB92 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill August 22, 2022
Bill August 11, 2022
Bill August 1, 2022
Bill June 14, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021