Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. | ||
Assembly | 12/07/2020 | Read first time. To print. |