California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB930 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2021

Amended

Bill June 24, 2021
Bill March 24, 2021