Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 13. Page 5423.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 21. Page 1906.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|