Assembly
|
02/01/2022
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/07/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|